Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kamal Hanna Bathish

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Titular Bishop of Ierichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1931 Born
29 Jun 195523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
29 Apr 199361.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
29 Apr 199361.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
3 Jul 199361.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
29 Oct 199462.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
9 Jun 200775.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Kamal Hanna Bathish
Bishop Kamal Hanna Bathish (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaifa
Ordained BishopSt-Sépulcre, Basilica, Jerusalem, Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast