Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Bonaventure Geoghegan, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Goulburn, Australia

Note/Previous Titular See: (died before installation at Goulburn)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1805Born
21 Feb 183024.9ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
25 Apr 183530.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
12 Apr 185954.0AppointedBishop of Adelaide, Australia
8 Sep 185954.4Ordained BishopBishop of Adelaide, Australia
1 Nov 185954.6InstalledBishop of Adelaide, Australia
12 Mar 186458.9AppointedBishop of Goulburn, Australia
9 May 186459.1DiedBishop of Goulburn, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Bonaventure Geoghegan (VIAF: 92263489)
Bishop Patrick Bonaventure Geoghegan O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Goulburn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Francis, Melbourne, Diocese of Melbourne

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 74, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017