Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Reville, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sandhurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1844Born
8 Sep 186723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
27 Jan 188540.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sandhurst, Australia
27 Jan 188540.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
29 Mar 188540.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
21 Oct 190157.4SucceededBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
19 Sep 191672.3DiedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Stephen Reville
Bishop Stephen Reville O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Sandhurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTagunnan, Ireland
Ordained BishopS. Kilian, Pro-Cathderal, Bendigo

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 196, and Page 498
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017