Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Bonaventure Sheil, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1814Born
24 Sep 183924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
23 Jun 186550.4AppointedBishop of Adelaide, Australia
15 Aug 186651.6Ordained BishopBishop of Adelaide, Australia
16 Sep 186651.7InstalledBishop of Adelaide, Australia
1 Mar 187257.1DiedBishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Laurence Bonaventure Sheil
Bishop Laurence Bonaventure Sheil O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWexford, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Francis, Melbourne, Diocese of Melbourne

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • bp/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017