Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Griver y Cuní

Deceased

Bishop of Perth, Australia

Note/Previous Titular See: Tloa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1814Born
17 Dec 184733.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gerona, Spain
28 Aug 184934.7Simple VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1862²47.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Perth, Australia
1 Oct 186954.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
12 Jun 187055.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
22 Jul 187358.6AppointedBishop of Perth, Australia
1 Nov 188671.9DiedBishop of Perth, Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín Griver y Cuní
Bishop Martín Griver y Cuní (born , died ) Bishop of Perth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranollers, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Ordained BishopSte Agathe des Irlandais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePerth, Diocese of Perth
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Cathedral, Perth, Diocese of Perth

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 447, and Page 557
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast