Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rubival Cabral Britto, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1969 Born
17 Dec 200031.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
7 Dec 201647.3AppointedBishop of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil
11 Feb 201747.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grajaú, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rubival Cabral Britto
Bishop Rubival Cabral Britto O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Grajaú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaguaquara
Ordained BishopGinásio do Esporte Raul Ferraz, Vitória da Conquista, Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grajaú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2016
  • c2+: CB, 11 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017