Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vítor Agnaldo de Menezes

Bishop-Elect of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1968 Born
18 Apr 199829.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil
25 Oct 201749.3AppointedBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
6 Jan 201849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
3 Feb 201849.6InstalledBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vítor Agnaldo de Menezes
Father Vítor Agnaldo de Menezes (born ) Bishop-Elect of Propriá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuraçá, Diocese of Juazeiro, Bahia
Ordained BishopIn front of, Santo Antônio, Cathedral, Jequié, Diocese of Jequié, Bahia

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Propriá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 25 Oct 2017
  • c2+: CB, 15 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Nov 2017