Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Julio Aguilar García

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz del Quiché

Note/Previous Titular See: (renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1923BornGuatemala City
21 Oct 195127.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 196945.4AppointedPrelate of Escuintla, Guatemala
5 Dec 197046.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bononia
15 Feb 197147.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bononia
2 Nov 197248.8AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala
22 Aug 197450.7ResignedBishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala
Dec 1999³75.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Julio Aguilar García:
Bishop José Julio Aguilar García (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Cruz del Quiché

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1973
  • ob/r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015