Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto José Gonçalves

Deceased

Bishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1859Born
17 Sep 188223.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 190849.8AppointedBishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil
2 Feb 190950.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil
28 Feb 190950.1InstalledBishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil
6 Mar 194586.1DiedBishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alberto José Gonçalves
Bishop Alberto José Gonçalves (born , died ) Bishop of Ribeirão Preto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmeira

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast