Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Robert Gorman

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Catula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1925 BornChicago
1 May 195630.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
16 Feb 198862.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
16 Feb 198862.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Catula
11 Apr 198862.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catula
24 Jan 200377.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for John Robert Gorman:
Bishop John Robert Gorman (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,622
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015