Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan

Dioecesis Belizepolitanus-Belmopanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dorick McGowan Wright, Bishop
  • Christopher John Glancy, C.S.V., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Osmond Peter Martin, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 31 December 1983
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Belize
  • Region: Antilles (West Indies)
  • Square Kilometers: 22,965 (8,870 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://catholic.bz/
  • Mailing Address: St. Joseph Parish, Landivar Streets, P.O. Box 330, Belize City, Belize
  • Telephone: (011)223.2235

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of British Honduras
10 June 1888ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica Prefecture Apostolic of British Honduras (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of British Honduras
3 January 1893ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of British Honduras Vicariate Apostolic of British Honduras
Vicariate Apostolic of Belize
15 December 1925Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of British Honduras Vicariate Apostolic of Belize
Diocese of Belize
29 February 1956ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Belize Diocese of Belize
Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan
31 December 1983Name ChangedDiocese of Belize Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Belize
194835,26359,22059.5%424281,25918969ap1951
Diocese of Belize
195953,00088,00060.2%328311,7092811610ap1960
196670,000109,30364.0%825332,1213012510ap1967
197074,500119,64562.3%828362,069369912ap1971
197685,000140,00060.7%1229412,073388612ap1977
198093,000155,10060.0%929382,4471398012ap1981
Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan
1990115,650185,72562.3%1329422,7531358113ap1991
1999132,940230,00057.8%1626423,1651366813ap2000
2000132,940230,00057.8%1726433,0911344713ap2001
2001132,940249,80053.2%1627433,0911335913ap2002
2002132,940249,80053.2%1822403,3233326113ap2003
2003132,940265,20050.1%2819472,8282276013ap2004
2004208,949273,70076.3%1615316,740185713ap2005
2006218,938287,73076.1%1713307,2975164913ap2007
2012157,573318,98649.4%1324374,2584295214ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013