Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Alberto Giraldo Restrepo, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1918Born
5 Aug 194526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
13 May 196041.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pasto, Colombia
13 May 196041.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Garriana
10 Jul 196041.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garriana
21 Nov 196142.9AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
1 Jul 197657.6DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Alberto Giraldo Restrepo
Bishop Jorge Alberto Giraldo Restrepo C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Pasto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonmatías

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast