Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donat Chiasson

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1930Born
6 May 195626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
23 Mar 197242.2AppointedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
1 Jun 197242.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
21 Sep 199565.7ResignedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
8 Oct 200373.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Donat Chiasson
Archbishop Donat Chiasson (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Moncton

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaquetville

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast