Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nematallah Carame, O.A.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1851Born
9 May 191362.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
22 Jun 191362.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
11 Apr 193180.2DiedTitular Bishop of Myndus

MicroData Summary for Nematallah Carame
Bishop Nematallah Carame O.A.M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Myndus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrummana, Lebanon

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast