Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emidio Cipollone

Archbishop of Lanciano-Ortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1960 BornCese di Avezzano
18 Aug 198424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Avezzano, Italy
11 Oct 201050.7AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano-Ortona, Italy
18 Dec 201050.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano-Ortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emidio Cipollone:
Archbishop Emidio Cipollone (born ) Archbishop of Lanciano-Ortona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lanciano-Ortona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,874

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013