Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amand Buseck, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda, Germany

Note/Previous Titular See: (Friedrich Franz Ludwig)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1685³Born
1 Nov 170419.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Sep 170823.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
9 May 170924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jan 172842.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
26 Jan 172842.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
9 May 172843.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
11 Dec 173853.8AppointedAbbot of Fulda, Germany
27 Nov 175267.8AppointedBishop of Fulda, Germany
6 Feb 175368.0InstalledBishop of Fulda, Germany
4 Dec 175671.8DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Amand Buseck
Bishop Amand Buseck O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEppelborn

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 374
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast