Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Hartard von Rollingen

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1633Born
165824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
26 Feb 171177.2SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
26 Sep 171278.7ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Sep 171480.7Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
30 Nov 171985.9DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Hartard von Rollingen
Bishop Heinrich Hartard von Rollingen (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnsemburg

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast