Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crescênzio Rinaldini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1925Born
26 Jun 194923.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 198256.3AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Jul 198256.5Ordained BishopBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Aug 200175.6RetiredBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Oct 201185.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Crescênzio Rinaldini
Bishop Crescênzio Rinaldini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGardone Val Trompia

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Oct 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast