Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingo Díaz Martínez

Archbishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1948 BornBravo
27 Jun 197728.9Ordained PriestPriest of Querétaro, México
23 Mar 200253.6AppointedBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
1 May 200253.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
4 Jun 200859.8AppointedArchbishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
31 Jul 200860.0InstalledArchbishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for Domingo Díaz Martínez:
Archbishop Domingo Díaz Martínez (born ) Archbishop of Tulancingo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tulancingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013