Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Felipe Solé Fa, C.M.

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1946 BornTarragona, Spain
29 Dec 197327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
18 Mar 200558.7AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Honduras
29 Jun 200558.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Luis Felipe Solé Fa:
Bishop Luis Felipe Solé Fa C.M. (born ) Bishop of Trujillo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trujillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,907

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013