Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Garcia Ayala

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campeche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1910BornYurécuaro
9 May 193726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
21 May 196352.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Campeche, México
21 May 196352.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
2 Aug 196353.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
27 Apr 196756.8AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
10 May 196756.9InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
9 Feb 198271.6ResignedBishop of Campeche, México
15 Jan 2014103.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Campeche, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Garcia Ayala:
Bishop José de Jesús Garcia Ayala (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campeche

  • a priest for 76.6 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • bp/bd: CB, 7 Aug 2011
  • d: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015