Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Bernal Vargas, L.C.

Prelate Emeritus of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1929 Born
15 Sep 195728.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
7 Dec 197344.7AppointedPrelate of Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México
7 Dec 197344.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Velefi
19 Mar 197445.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velefi
15 Feb 197848.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Velefi
26 Oct 200475.6RetiredPrelate of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México

MicroData Summary for Jorge Bernal Vargas
Bishop Jorge Bernal Vargas L.C. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Cancún-Chetumal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceApizaco

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Cancún-Chetumal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast