Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Fusco

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1939BornCampobasso
15 Jul 196223.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 199556.4AppointedBishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy
7 Oct 199556.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy
11 Jul 199960.2DiedBishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Fusco:
Bishop Vittorio Fusco (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛-Gallipoli

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,620
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013