Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Dominikus Franz Kilian Cardinal von Lamberg

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1680Born
21 Sep 170323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
13 Mar 171231.6AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
4 Jul 171231.9Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
2 Jan 172342.4SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
15 Mar 172342.6ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
10 Apr 172342.7InstalledBishop of Passau, Germany
20 Dec 173757.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 174060.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
30 Aug 176181.1DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Dominikus Franz Kilian von Lamberg
Joseph Dominikus Franz Kilian Cardinal von Lamberg (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSteyr
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
  • a cardinal for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,463
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 9
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1737
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,475, and Number 4,479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Sep 2020

Quantcast