Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vinzenz Eduard Milde

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1777³BornBrno, Czech Republic
24 Aug 179922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
9 Mar 180022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
16 Jan 182345.7SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
16 May 182346.0ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
13 Jul 182346.2Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
27 Dec 183154.6SelectedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
24 Feb 183254.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
31 May 183255.1InstalledArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
14 Mar 185375.8DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vinzenz Eduard Milde:
Archbishop Vinzenz Eduard Milde (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 242, and Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013