Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Raymundo Sabio, M.S.C.

Prefect Emeritus of Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

Priest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1946 Born
29 Jun 196923.3ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
28 Dec 197125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
21 Dec 200761.8AppointedPrefect of Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
28 Jun 201771.3ResignedPrefect of Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Raymundo Sabio
Father Raymundo Sabio M.S.C. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Marshall Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTabungan, Philippines

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Marshall Islands.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017