Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oskar Formánek, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1915Born
29 Jan 193418.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
25 Jan 194529.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
Aug 1972³56.9Ordained BishopBishop
21 Jul 199175.8DiedBishop

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oskar Formánek
Bishop Oskar Formánek S.J. (born , died ) Bishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLysá pod Makytou, Slovakia

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,526
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast