Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Albert Buswell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pueblo, Colorado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1913BornHomestead, OK
9 Jul 193925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
8 Aug 195945.8AppointedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
30 Sep 195946.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
19 Sep 197965.9ResignedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
14 Jun 200894.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Pueblo, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Albert Buswell:
Bishop Charles Albert Buswell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pueblo

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 81
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013