Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien Prosper Ernest Fischer, C.S.Sp.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

Titular Bishop of Avioccala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1933 Born
29 Jun 196228.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
30 Sep 196228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 Feb 200066.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
17 Feb 200066.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Avioccala
18 Jun 200066.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avioccala
19 Jun 200975.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

MicroData Summary for Lucien Prosper Ernest Fischer
Bishop Lucien Prosper Ernest Fischer C.S.Sp. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrasbourg, Archdiocese of Strasbourg, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Church, Saint-Pierre, Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast