Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Karl Maria Cajetan von Firmian

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1741BornSalzburg
2 Apr 176826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
20 Dec 177332.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
20 Dec 177332.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
16 Jan 177432.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
17 Aug 177634.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Karl Maria Cajetan von Firmian:
Bishop Franz Karl Maria Cajetan von Firmian (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 8.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101, and Page 453
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1774, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Dec 2015