Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Afonso Fioreze, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1942Born
3 Feb 196421.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
26 Jul 197028.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
5 Nov 200361.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
15 Feb 200461.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
15 Sep 200462.2SucceededBishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
12 Jul 201775.1RetiredBishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
6 Feb 202178.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Afonso Fioreze
Bishop Afonso Fioreze C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luziânia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio Branco do Sul
Ordained BishopGinásio de esportes Votorantim, Rio Branco do Sul
Death PlaceProvincial House, Passionists, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Luziânia, Diocese of Luziânia, Goias

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,533
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2017
  • d: CB, 6 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast