Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos de Oliveira, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1931 BornAparecida
2 Feb 195220.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Jan 195725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Sep 197948.5AppointedPrelate of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil
25 Nov 197948.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil
4 Dec 197948.7AppointedBishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil
27 Feb 200877.0RetiredBishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos de Oliveira:
Bishop José Carlos de Oliveira C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013