Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia

Dioecesis Rubiatabensis-Mozarlandensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Goiânia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Goias
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 26,797 (10,350 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 46, Rua Xixa 100, 76350-000 Rubiataba, GO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (062)3325-1211
  • Fax: 3325-1744

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba
11 October 1966ErectedDiocese of Goiás
Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu)
Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia
18 April 1979Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Rubiataba Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia
Diocese of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia Diocese of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba
1966100,000.0%26803ap1967
1968185,000190,00097.4%4446,25018162ap1971
1976175,000197,00088.8%391214,583203412ap1977
Territorial Prelature of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia
Diocese of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia
198090,600102,00088.8%311146,471203619ap1981
199091,00097,00093.8%67137,0001143412ap1991
199992,000102,20090.0%206263,538222613ap2000
200091,000102,20089.0%114156,06671815ap2001
200190,00094,91094.8%121136,92321913ap2002
200290,00094,91094.8%151165,62531913ap2003
200374,83595,55078.3%132154,98941414ap2004
200484,835105,55080.4%132155,655141414ap2005
201090,500122,35074.0%142165,65621614ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013