Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Roveggio, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan

Titular Bishop of Amastris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1858Born
29 Mar 188425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
8 Feb 189536.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
8 Feb 189536.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amastris
21 Apr 189536.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amastris
2 May 190243.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Roveggio
Bishop Antonio Maria Roveggio F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Sebastiano di Cologna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona, Italy

  • a priest for 18.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017