Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Robino

Deceased

Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1805Born
27 May 185347.7SelectedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
27 Jun 185347.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
3 Jul 185347.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
28 Aug 186863.0DiedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Robino
Archbishop Angelo Robino (born , died ) Archbishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalemi
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 531
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast