Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Brinciotti

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

Titular Archbishop of Sebastea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1815BornSant'Angelo in Pontano
22 Dec 183823.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 185136.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Civitavecchia, Italy
5 Sep 185136.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
7 Sep 185136.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
23 Jun 185438.9AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
16 Nov 186752.3ResignedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
20 Dec 186752.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
18 Nov 186853.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Brinciotti:
Bishop Gaetano Brinciotti (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 139, and Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 506

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013