Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Beira

Archidioecesis Beirensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Claudio Dalla Zuanna, S.C.I., Archbishop
  • Jaime Pedro Gonçalves, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 June 1984
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Mozambique
  • Square Kilometers: 78,018 (30,134 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arquiepiscopal, Rua Correia de Brito 613, C.P. 544, Beira, Mocambique
  • Telephone: 23.322.313
  • Fax: 23.327.639

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Beira
4 September 1940ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Mozambico Diocese of Beira (erected)
6 October 1954Territory LostDiocese of Beira Diocese of Quelimane (erected)
6 May 1962Territory LostDiocese of Beira Diocese of Tete (erected)
Archdiocese of Beira
4 June 1984ElevatedDiocese of Beira Archdiocese of Beira
19 November 1990Territory LostArchdiocese of Beira Diocese of Chimoio (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Beira
195047,7521,922,5962.5%1065756362965ap1951
195890,4731,105,0608.2%781881,02833ap1960
1970127,768940,78913.6%1173841,52110617316ap1971
198090,000924,0009.7%128293,103345332ap1981
Archdiocese of Beira
198896,8001,826,0005.3%322253,872287833ap1991
1999169,6211,317,00012.9%636424,0385411419ap2000
2000262,2361,346,00019.5%1032426,2434811223ap2001
2001702,9601,289,39054.5%12324415,9764810223ap2002
2002794,8901,289,39061.6%16355115,586479322ap2003
2003778,7461,328,60458.6%16446012,9795810026ap2004
2004755,3001,289,39058.6%22476910,9466110226ap2005
2006783,0001,336,00058.6%21486911,347649933ap2007
2012847,0001,525,00055.5%34336712,641587346ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013