Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Déruaz

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1826Born
25 May 185024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
14 Mar 189164.8AppointedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
19 Mar 189164.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
29 Sep 191185.3DiedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Déruaz (VIAF: 88873019)
Bishop Joseph Déruaz (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne et Genève

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChoulex, Diocese of Lausanne et Genève
Ordained BishopCollege Canadian des 4 Font., Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017