Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Édouard-Joseph Bélin

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1821BornObigies
26 Jul 184624.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Feb 184725.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188462.6AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
15 Apr 188462.6Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
7 Feb 189270.4DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Édouard-Joseph Bélin:
Bishop Édouard-Joseph Bélin (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 401
  • c2+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014