Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Mark Gerbermann, M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huehuetenango

Titular Bishop of Pinhel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1913BornNada, TX, USA
7 Feb 194329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
8 Aug 196147.9AppointedPrelate of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
6 Jun 196248.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
22 Jul 196248.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
23 Dec 196754.2AppointedBishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
22 Jul 197561.8ResignedBishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
22 Jul 197561.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
22 Jul 197561.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
30 Jun 198268.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
19 Oct 199683.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Huehuetenango, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Hugo Mark Gerbermann:
Bishop Hugo Mark Gerbermann M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huehuetenango

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ab/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015