Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jayakody Aratchige Don Anton Jayakody

Auxiliary Bishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka

Titular Bishop of Mulli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1958 Born
27 Jul 198526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo, Sri Lanka
4 Apr 201859.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
4 Apr 201859.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulli
23 Jun 201859.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulli

MicroData Summary for Jayakody Aratchige Don Anton Jayakody
Bishop Jayakody Aratchige Don Anton Jayakody (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Colombo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamunugama, Archdiocese of Colombo in Ceylon
Ordained BishopSt. Lucia, Cathedral, Colombo, Archdiocese of Colombo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Colombo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Apr 2018
  • c34: CB, 4 May 2018
  • c3+: CB, 23 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast