Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Joseph Fernando, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Badulla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1921BornPitipana
6 Aug 194928.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
9 Apr 196847.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka
9 Apr 196847.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Igilgili
17 Jul 196847.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Igilgili
5 Dec 198362.7AppointedBishop of Badulla, Sri Lanka
3 Mar 199775.9RetiredBishop of Badulla, Sri Lanka
16 Jul 200483.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Badulla, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Edmund Joseph Fernando:
Bishop Edmund Joseph Fernando O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Badulla

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013