Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Fenton

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1837Born
22 Sep 186629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
25 Apr 190466.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
25 Apr 190466.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
29 May 190466.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
22 Aug 191881.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Fenton (VIAF: 315639671)
Bishop Patrick Fenton (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoho, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlacePoor Sisters of Nazareth, Convent, Bexhill-on-Sea, East Sussex, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1904, Number 26
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 91
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 31 Mar 2018