Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonard Ludwig Baumbach, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli

Titular Bishop of Soli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1855BornLudwigsburg, Germany
1880¹24.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
1 Mar 191054.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
1 Mar 191054.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
17 Apr 191054.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
31 Mar 191357.8SucceededBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
13 Feb 191559.7ResignedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
13 Feb 191559.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
23 Apr 191559.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonard Ludwig Baumbach:
Bishop Leonard Ludwig Baumbach C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013