Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Anthony Johnson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Arindela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1832Born
19 Dec 185725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
20 Apr 190673.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
20 Apr 190673.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
1 May 190673.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
27 Mar 190976.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Anthony Johnson
Bishop William Anthony Johnson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomers Town, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, Ambrosden Avenue, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 30
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 131
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast