Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Fenech, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jhansi, India

Titular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1892Born
23 May 191826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Jan 194653.8AppointedPrefect of Jhansi, India
18 Jul 195462.3AppointedBishop of Jhansi, India
28 Nov 195462.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jhansi, India
8 May 196775.1RetiredBishop of Jhansi, India
8 May 196775.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
13 May 196977.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Jhansi, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Fenech
Bishop Francis Xavier Fenech O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jhansi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFloriana, Malta

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast