Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Galea

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

Titular Bishop of Tralles in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1891BornSenglea
18 Dec 191524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
9 Jun 194250.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
9 Jun 194250.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
5 Jul 194250.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
21 Aug 197482.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Galea:
Bishop Emanuele Galea (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1942, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013