Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mauro Caruana, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1867BornFloriana
11 Nov 188518.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1888²20.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Mar 189123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jan 191547.2AppointedBishop of Malta
22 Jan 191547.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
10 Feb 191547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
25 Feb 191547.3InstalledBishop of Malta
29 Mar 192860.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Malta
17 Dec 194376.1DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mauro Caruana:
Archbishop Mauro Caruana O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013