Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jhansi

Dioecesis Ihansiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Parapullil, Bishop
  • Frederick D’Souza, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 5 July 1954
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Agra
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 29,418 (11,362 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 64 Cantt., Jhansi-284001, U.P., India
  • Telephone: (0510)2471.391; 2370.024
  • Fax: 2471.594

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Jhansi
12 January 1940ErectedDiocese of Allahabad Prefecture Apostolic of Jhansi (erected)
Diocese of Jhansi
5 July 1954ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Jhansi Diocese of Jhansi
9 February 1999Territory LostDiocese of Jhansi Diocese of Gwalior (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Jhansi
19502,2002,551,291.1%1713307342225ap1951
Diocese of Jhansi
19703,31513,854,235.0%172191743817ap1971
19803,59215,300,000.0%254291232616115ap1981
19904,7108,377,114.1%404441071416524ap1991
19994,8176,709,184.1%251261851615219ap2000
20004,0896,730,000.1%341351161016119ap2001
20013,7246,815,000.1%39140931013820ap2002
20023,7807,013,000.1%38139961113920ap2003
20033,9947,004,993.1%381391021215120ap2004
20043,7207,254,260.1%40242881314920ap2005
20063,7828,315,000.0%42143871120321ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 10 Jan 2013