Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Pace

Deceased

Bishop of Gozo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1890BornVictoria
3 Aug 191323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gozo, Malta
1 Nov 194454.4AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
17 Dec 194454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gozo, Malta
8 Apr 194554.9InstalledBishop of Gozo, Malta
31 Mar 197281.8DiedBishop of Gozo, Malta

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pace:
Bishop Joseph Pace (born , died ) Bishop of Gozo

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1944, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013